NV AB136 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing bail in certain criminal cases. (BDR 14-708)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing bail in certain criminal cases. (BDR 14-708)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-05-29AssemblyBill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-26AssemblyReturned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.
2017-05-26AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-05-23AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 391.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-10AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
2017-02-10AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback