NV AB135 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to schedules for the retention and disposal of official state records. (BDR 19-547)
Title
Revises provisions relating to schedules for the retention and disposal of official state records. (BDR 19-547)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 405. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 998.) To printer. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | Amended. (Amend. No. 208.) |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |