NV AB132 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Summary
Revises certain provisions relating to an award of damages in an action for forcible or unlawful entry or detention of real property. (BDR 3-791)
Title
Revises certain provisions relating to an award of damages in an action for forcible or unlawful entry or detention of real property. (BDR 3-791)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7. | |
2009-04-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-03-27 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-03-25 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-24 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-23 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-17 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-03-04 | In Senate. | |
2009-03-03 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-03-02 | Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-02 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-02-27 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-02-26 | Read second time. | |
2009-02-25 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=287 |