NV AB125 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - To printer.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; prohibiting modification of bail in certain circumstances; revising provisions governing conditions of bail; revising provisions governing the consequences for failing to comply with conditions of bail; making various other changes concerning the manner in which bail is determined, the amount of bail and modifications to bail; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing bail. (BDR 14-542)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 12, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-24AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 891.)
2019-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) To printer.
2019-05-23AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-15AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
2019-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback