NV AB124 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; requiring the development and distribution of a document consisting of information for victims of sexual assault or attempted sexual assault; requiring a hospital or independent center for emergency medical care to provide a copy of the document to each victim of sexual assault or attempted sexual assault treated by the hospital or independent center for emergency medical care; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires a hospital or independent center for emergency medical care to provide certain information to a victim of sexual assault or attempted sexual assault. (BDR 40-591)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 154.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |