NV AB123 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 149.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 149.
Summary
Revises provisions governing certain offices of physicians and related facilities and surgical centers for ambulatory patients. (BDR 40-215)
Title
Revises provisions governing certain offices of physicians and related facilities and surgical centers for ambulatory patients. (BDR 40-215)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 149. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee. | |
2009-04-30 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-15 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 328.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2009-01-28 | From printer. | |
2009-01-27 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=265 |