NV AB122 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 418.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to the manner in which the State Board of Examiners awards compensation to certain victims of crime. (BDR 16-305)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to the manner in which the State Board of Examiners awards compensation to certain victims of crime. (BDR 16-305)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 418.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateRead second time.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 264.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-07AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
2017-02-09AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback