NV AB122 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions concerning the imposition of certain reasonable restrictions or requirements relating to systems for obtaining wind energy. (BDR 22-592)
Title
Revises provisions concerning the imposition of certain reasonable restrictions or requirements relating to systems for obtaining wind energy. (BDR 22-592)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217. | |
2011-05-31 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-29 | Senate Amendment No. 707 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-05-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 707.) To printer. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-27 | To Senate. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) | |
2011-04-26 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 543.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 508.) To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. | |
2011-02-03 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |