NV AB121 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to incarcerated persons; requiring institutions and facilities of the Department of Corrections to provide incarcerated persons with original, physical copies of mail under certain circumstances; authorizing the Director of the Department to adopt regulations exempting the Department from the requirement to provide incarcerated persons with original, physical copies of mail under certain circumstances; requiring such institutions and facilities and city or county jails and detention facilities to provide notification to certain persons of a critical medical condition of an incarcerated person; requiring such institutions, facilities and jails to provide an opportunity for an incarcerated person to call a friend, relative or other person to provide notification of a critical medical condition of the incarcerated person under certain circumstances; requiring such institutions, facilities and jails to ensure the timely filling of prescriptions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to incarcerated persons. (BDR 16-138)
Sponsors
Rep. Venicia Considine [D] | Rep. Natha Anderson [D] | Rep. Shannon Bilbray-Axelrod [D] | Rep. Cecelia Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Shondra Summers-Armstrong [D] | Sen. Rochelle Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184. (Effective October 1, 2023) |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 664 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 664.) To printer. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 23 and 24.) To printer. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |