NV AB120 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to business; exempting businesses that have gross revenue below a certain amount from the requirement to obtain a state business license; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Exempts businesses that have gross revenue below a certain amount from the requirement to obtain a state business license. (BDR 7-594)
Sponsors
Rep. Annie Black [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Andy Matthews [R] | Rep. Richard McArthur [R] | Rep. Philip O'Neill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7441/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB120.pdf |