NV AB117 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; defining domestic terror activity to include certain offenses; creating the Anti-Domestic Terrorism Assistance Account in the State General Fund to award grants to support state and local programs to counter domestic terror activity; requiring the Chief of the Investigation Division of the Department of Public Safety to assist in the investigation of domestic terror activity upon the request of a law enforcement agency; authorizing the Chief of the Investigation Division to enter into agreements with intelligence centers; revising the definition of act of terrorism and the definitions of related terms; revising provisions relating to criminal anarchy and criminal syndicalism; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to domestic terrorism. (BDR 43-568)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 316.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |