NV AB116 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to vehicles; establishing civil penalties for certain traffic and related violations; defining certain traffic and vehicle violations as misdemeanors; creating procedures for civil infractions for traffic and related violations to be adjudicated; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to traffic offenses. (BDR 43-491)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 311.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time.
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-02AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback