NV AB114 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 146.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 146.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing irrigation districts. (BDR 48-639)
Title
Revises provisions governing irrigation districts. (BDR 48-639)
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 146. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |