NV AB114 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 444.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing restitution. (BDR 14-560)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing restitution. (BDR 14-560)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 444.
2015-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 711 concurred in.
2015-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-16SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2015-05-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 711.) To printer.
2015-05-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-23SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 623.) To printer.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 70.) To printer.
2015-04-20AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2015-04-20AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-04-08AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-04-08AssemblyTaken from General File.
2015-04-06AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-04-03AssemblyRead second time.
2015-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-05AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback