NV AB113 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; increasing the limitation of time within which a criminal prosecution for sex trafficking must be commenced; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Increases the limitation of time within which a criminal prosecution for sex trafficking must be commenced. (BDR 14-610)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 180. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 207.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |