NV AB109 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to public utilities. (BDR 58-622)
Title
Revises provisions relating to public utilities. (BDR 58-622)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |