NV AB109 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 236.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 236.
Summary
Revises provisions governing special license plates. (BDR 43-958)
Title
Revises provisions governing special license plates. (BDR 43-958)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 236. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendment No. 620 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 620.) To printer. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-29 | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-04-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-24 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-13 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-04-09 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 174.) To printer. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-01 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-03-31 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-31 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-03-30 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 2.) To printer. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2009-01-23 | From printer. | |
2009-01-22 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=245 |