NV AB107 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 127. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to pharmacy; requiring a pharmacist who is employed by an off-site pharmaceutical service provider and provides certain services to a hospital or correctional institution in this State to be registered to practice pharmacy in this State; revising provisions governing certain pharmacies located outside this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing certain pharmacies located outside this State. (BDR 54-109)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 127. (Effective October 1, 2023)
2023-05-29AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2023-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2023-05-25SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-24SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-23SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-11SenateRead second time.
2023-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateIn Senate.
2023-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2023-03-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-03-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-03-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-03-17AssemblyRead second time.
2023-03-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2023-02-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2023-02-03AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback