NV AB107 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81.
Summary
Creates the Advisory Committee for the Prevention and Treatment of Stroke and Heart Disease within the Health Division of the Department of Health and Human Services. (BDR 40-208)
Title
Creates the Advisory Committee for the Prevention and Treatment of Stroke and Heart Disease within the Health Division of the Department of Health and Human Services. (BDR 40-208)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Amendment No. 597 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-11 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-08 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 597.) To printer. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-24 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee. | |
2009-04-24 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-06 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-06 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 99.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2009-01-14 | From printer. | |
2009-01-09 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=231 |