NV AB105 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to interscholastic activities; requiring any board formed to govern the Nevada Interscholastic Activities Association to include at least three members who are parents or guardians of pupils who participate in a sanctioned sport; requiring any advisory board to a governing board to include at least three members who are pupils currently participating in a sanctioned sport; establishing certain requirements relating to the residency and terms of such members who are parents, guardians or pupils; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing interscholastic activities. (BDR 34-517)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Chapter 511. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 540 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 540.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 158.) To printer. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |