NV AB104 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the designation and operation of charter agencies. (BDR 18-762)
Title
Provides for the designation and operation of charter agencies. (BDR 18-762)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | To committee. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2015-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-01-31 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=232 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB104.pdf |