NV AB102 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; revising certain requirements relating to the issuance to certain veterans of an annual permit for entering, camping and boating in state parks and recreational areas; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises requirements for the issuance of certain annual permits for entering, camping and boating in state parks and recreational areas. (BDR 35-877)
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. Richard McArthur [R] | Rep. Philip O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Thomas Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 103. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 337.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |