NV AB1 | 2013 | 27th Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes concerning the abatement or deferment of certain taxes imposed on a new or expanded business. (BDR 32-9)
Title
Makes various changes concerning the abatement or deferment of certain taxes imposed on a new or expanded business. (BDR 32-9)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | To printer. From printer. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Committee of the Whole. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | Read first time. |