NM SM92 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study gallup indian market
Title
Study gallup indian market
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (22-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |