NM SM87 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Demise Of Rural Grocery Stores
Title
Study Demise Of Rural Grocery Stores
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | [LD 32] Signed by one or both houses |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |