NM SM67 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Radiation Exposure Compensation
Title
Federal Radiation Exposure Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Conservation |