NM SM38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Missing & Murdered Indigenous Women
Title
Missing & Murdered Indigenous Women
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Sen. John Pinto [D] | Sen. Benny Shendo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:43 N:0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-26 | Senate | SIAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SIAC |