NM SM25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School-to-work For Students With Disabilities
Title
School-to-work For Students With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (34-0) |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |