NM SM22 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-28 - [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-28 - [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"grant County Day"
Title
"grant County Day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Passed Senate (43-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Not Referred to Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Not Printed |