NM SM12 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dona Ana Youth-centered Programs
Title
Dona Ana Youth-centered Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (43-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |