NM SM1 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Paid Family And Medical Leave Task Force
Title
Paid Family And Medical Leave Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:14 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | multiple floor amendments |
2022-02-08 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-31 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SHPAC |