NM SJR7 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (53-2) SGND (C.A. 4).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (53-2) SGND (C.A. 4).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' organization property tax, ca
Title
Veterans' organization property tax, ca
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (53-2) SGND (C.A. 4). | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HTRC- DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP - PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SRC/SJC-SRC |