NM SJR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College Regent Nominating Committees, Ca
Title
College Regent Nominating Committees, Ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-13 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-09 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HJC |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:24 N:15 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |