NM SJR14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-29 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-29 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislatively Limit Property Value Raises, Ca
Title
Legislatively Limit Property Value Raises, Ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (26-13) |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |