NM SJR13 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Dot Real Property
Title
Transfer Dot Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2021-03-15 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/STBTC |