NM SJM6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-24 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-24 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sandia Science & Tech Park 20th Anniversary
Title
Sandia Science & Tech Park 20th Anniversary
Sponsors
Sen. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-24 | House | tabled temporarily by motion in House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |