NM SJM53 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] w/drn - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] w/drn - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nm tech center for border security
Title
Nm tech center for border security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] w/drn - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] tbld/H | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SEC | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] SRC/SEC-SRC |