NM SJM45 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (56-3) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (56-3) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study use of los luceros property
Title
Study use of los luceros property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Passed House (56-3) Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |