NM SJM34 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] w/drn - PASSED/H (59-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] w/drn - PASSED/H (59-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
E911 committee testimony to legislature
Title
E911 committee testimony to legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] w/drn - PASSED/H (59-0) SGND. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] tbld/H | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SPAC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SRC/SPAC-SRC |