NM SJM22 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Name Submarine Uss Los Alamos
Title
Name Submarine Uss Los Alamos
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (66-0) |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] HSIVC |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] HSIVC |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (34-0) |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S |