NM SJM2 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 8] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 8] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Frontier Community Challenges Work Group
Title
Frontier Community Challenges Work Group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 8] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (65-0) |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] HLEDC |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] HLEDC |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (33-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |