NM SJM18 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Operational Study Of Prc
Title
Operational Study Of Prc
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (63-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Business & Employment |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |