NM SJM14 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-18 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-18 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce School Reporting Requirements Study
Title
Reduce School Reporting Requirements Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-18 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2023-03-18 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2023-03-18 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2023-03-16 | House | tabled temporarily by motion in House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |