NM SJM11 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vision for high-quality education in nm
Title
Vision for high-quality education in nm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | Senate | [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Passed House (55-0) |
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to H |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (22-16) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Education |