NM SB95 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Radioactive Waste Consultation Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Radioactive Waste Consultation Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateFailed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
2020-02-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2020-02-15SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-07SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-03SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-22SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SCONC/SJC
2020-01-21SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback