NM SB95 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] SGND BY GOV (Mar.20) Ch. 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] SGND BY GOV (Mar.20) Ch. 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganize dept. of public safety
Title
Reorganize dept. of public safety
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] SGND BY GOV (Mar.20) Ch. 3. |
2015-03-12 | House | [LD 38] Passed House (54-1) |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] HSCAC |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (31-9) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] fl and then to sub adptd |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |