NM SB94 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add fireworks that may be banned
Title
Add fireworks that may be banned
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=94&year=14 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/14%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0094.pdf |