NM SB94 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (58-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (58-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Land grant tort liability coverage
Title
Land grant tort liability coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (58-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.22. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HJC- DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP - PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] germane-SCONC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SCC/SCONC/SJC-SCC |