NM SB86 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Tabled Indefinitely, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Tabled Indefinitely, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual Development Act Appropriation
Title
Individual Development Act Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Tabled Indefinitely, Bill Has Died |
2019-01-28 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=86&year=19 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/19%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0086.pdf |