NM SB84 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HTRC- DP - PASSED/H (63-1) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HTRC- DP - PASSED/H (63-1) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jet fuel gross receipts credit
Title
Jet fuel gross receipts credit
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HTRC- DP - PASSED/H (63-1) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 74. | |
2011-02-19 | [LD 33] HBIC/HTRC-HBIC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] PASSED/S (37-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCORC/SFC-SCORC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |